Docket History
4/29/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
1/11/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
JANUARY 28, 2016 AT 9:30 AM BY TELEPHONE
1/11/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
JANUARY 28, 2016 AT 9:30 AM BY TELEPHONE
12/28/2015
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
15 CV 6035
12/28/2015
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
15 CV 6035
12/28/2015
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
15 CV 6035
12/28/2015
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
15 CV 6035
11/17/2015
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
11/17/2015
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
11/17/2015
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
11/17/2015
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE