ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED HEREIN ON MARCH 07, 2016. RESPONDENT'S MEMORANDUM CONTRA IS DUE ON OR BEFORE MARCH 21, 2016. MOVANT'S REPLY IS DUE ON OR BEFORE MARCH 28, 2016.
Matthew Taulbee
Docket History
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED HEREIN ON MARCH 07, 2016. RESPONDENT'S MEMORANDUM CONTRA IS DUE ON OR BEFORE MARCH 21, 2016. MOVANT'S REPLY IS DUE ON OR BEFORE MARCH 28, 2016.
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED HEREIN ON MARCH 07, 2016. RESPONDENT'S MEMORANDUM CONTRA IS DUE ON OR BEFORE MARCH 21, 2016. MOVANT'S REPLY IS DUE ON OR BEFORE MARCH 28, 2016.
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED HEREIN ON MARCH 07, 2016. RESPONDENT'S MEMORANDUM CONTRA IS DUE ON OR BEFORE MARCH 21, 2016. MOVANT'S REPLY IS DUE ON OR BEFORE MARCH 28, 2016.
3/7/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE MARCH 11, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.
3/7/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE MARCH 11, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.
3/7/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE MARCH 11, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.