Docket History
3/28/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 1, 2016
3/28/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 1, 2016
3/28/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 1, 2016
3/8/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 1, 2016 FILED BY JOHN CLUNK
3/8/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 1, 2016 FILED BY JOHN CLUNK
3/8/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 1, 2016 FILED BY JOHN CLUNK
3/8/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 1, 2016 FILED BY JOHN CLUNK
1/25/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY
1/25/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY
12/6/2015
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.