Docket History
5/19/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; 6/7/16 AT 8:30 A.M.
5/19/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; 6/7/16 AT 8:30 A.M.
5/19/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; 6/7/16 AT 8:30 A.M.
5/5/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
5/5/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
5/5/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
4/22/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE; APRIL 27, 2016 AT 8:50 A.M.
4/22/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE; APRIL 27, 2016 AT 8:50 A.M.
4/22/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE; APRIL 27, 2016 AT 8:50 A.M.
4/22/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE; APRIL 27, 2016 AT 8:50 A.M.
9/21/2015
CIVIL ALL OTHER