Docket History
4/14/2016
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
TO COMPEL
4/14/2016
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
TO COMPEL
4/14/2016
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
TO COMPEL
3/14/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DATE TO FILE RESPONDENTS MEMO CONTRA AND MOVANTS REPLY TO RESPONDENTS MEMO CONTRA
3/14/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DATE TO FILE RESPONDENTS MEMO CONTRA AND MOVANTS REPLY TO RESPONDENTS MEMO CONTRA
3/14/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DATE TO FILE RESPONDENTS MEMO CONTRA AND MOVANTS REPLY TO RESPONDENTS MEMO CONTRA
3/14/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DATE TO FILE RESPONDENTS MEMO CONTRA AND MOVANTS REPLY TO RESPONDENTS MEMO CONTRA
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE MARCH 22, 2016 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE MARCH 29, 2016
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE MARCH 22, 2016 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE MARCH 29, 2016
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE MARCH 22, 2016 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE MARCH 29, 2016
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE MARCH 22, 2016 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE MARCH 29, 2016
2/4/2016
DECISION
GRANTING PLAINTIFF MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS ADMITTED
2/4/2016
DECISION
GRANTING PLAINTIFF MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS ADMITTED
2/4/2016
DECISION
GRANTING PLAINTIFF MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS ADMITTED
2/4/2016
DECISION
GRANTING PLAINTIFF MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS ADMITTED
9/16/2015
WORKER COMPENSATION