Case Information
5/23/2016
2015CV04551
Common Pleas
21st Mortgage Corporation
Tonya M Carter
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE ANSWER INSTANTER AND SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON JUNE 10, 2016 AT 8:30 AM
Michelle Polly Murphy
Docket History
5/23/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE ANSWER INSTANTER AND SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON JUNE 10, 2016 AT 8:30 AM
4/29/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
MOTION TO FILE ANSWER INSTANTER RESPONSE DUE 5/12/16; REPLY DUE 5/19/16
4/29/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
MOTION TO FILE ANSWER INSTANTER RESPONSE DUE 5/12/16; REPLY DUE 5/19/16
4/7/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON APRIL 21, 2016 AT 8:30 AM
4/7/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON APRIL 21, 2016 AT 8:30 AM
4/7/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON APRIL 21, 2016 AT 8:30 AM
8/31/2015
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE