Docket History
5/17/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
6/17/16 FILED BY MATTHEW GLADWELL
3/7/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 11, 2016
3/7/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 11, 2016
3/7/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 11, 2016
2/4/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 3/11/16 FILED BY MATTHEW GLADWELL
2/4/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 3/11/16 FILED BY MATTHEW GLADWELL
2/4/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 3/11/16 FILED BY MATTHEW GLADWELL
2/4/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 3/11/16 FILED BY MATTHEW GLADWELL
8/26/2015
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE