Docket History
4/22/2016
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
AND DEED AND DISTRIBUTION
4/22/2016
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
AND DEED AND DISTRIBUTION
4/22/2016
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
AND DEED AND DISTRIBUTION
3/3/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 18, 2016 FILED BY ALEXANDER ARESTIDES
3/3/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 18, 2016 FILED BY ALEXANDER ARESTIDES
3/3/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 18, 2016 FILED BY ALEXANDER ARESTIDES
3/3/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 18, 2016 FILED BY ALEXANDER ARESTIDES
1/21/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
1/21/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
1/21/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
1/21/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
1/11/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
1/11/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
8/25/2015
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE