Docket History
5/18/2016
DECISION
GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER INSTANTER
5/18/2016
DECISION
GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER INSTANTER
5/18/2016
DECISION
GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER INSTANTER
4/15/2016
ORDER: VACATE JUDGMENT ENTRY
4/15/2016
ORDER: VACATE JUDGMENT ENTRY
4/15/2016
ORDER: VACATE JUDGMENT ENTRY
4/15/2016
ORDER: VACATE JUDGMENT ENTRY
4/13/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 5/20/16 FILED BY JACQUELINE WIRTZ
4/13/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 5/20/16 FILED BY JACQUELINE WIRTZ
4/13/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 5/20/16 FILED BY JACQUELINE WIRTZ
4/13/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 5/20/16 FILED BY JACQUELINE WIRTZ
3/16/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT
3/16/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT
1/31/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE MARCH 4, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.
1/20/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
1/20/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
1/20/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
1/20/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE