Docket History
4/26/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT Receipt: 1099112 Date: 04/26/2016
4/26/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
4/26/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT Receipt: 1099112 Date: 04/26/2016
3/24/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SUMMARY JUDGMENT OUT OF TIME
3/24/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SUMMARY JUDGMENT OUT OF TIME
3/24/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SUMMARY JUDGMENT OUT OF TIME
3/24/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SUMMARY JUDGMENT OUT OF TIME
3/24/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SUMMARY JUDGMENT OUT OF TIME
3/24/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SUMMARY JUDGMENT OUT OF TIME
9/18/2015
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON OCTOBER 23, 2015 AT 900AM
8/4/2015
CIVIL ALL OTHER