ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE MARCH 10, 2016 AND MOVANT'S REPLY DUE MARCH 17, 2016
2/25/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE MARCH 10, 2016 AND MOVANT'S REPLY DUE MARCH 17, 2016
2/25/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE MARCH 10, 2016 AND MOVANT'S REPLY DUE MARCH 17, 2016
2/25/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE MARCH 10, 2016 AND MOVANT'S REPLY DUE MARCH 17, 2016
8/18/2015
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON SEPTEMBER 22, 2015 AT 9:00 AM