Case Information
2/8/2016
2015CV03785
Common Pleas
Pnc Bank National Association
John Doe Henderson Unknown Spouse Of Katherine C Henderson
NOTICE: DISMISSAL ENTRY WITHOUT PREJUDICE
FILED BY JOSHUA EPLING Receipt: 1087034 Date: 02/08/2016
Joshua Epling
Docket History
2/8/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL ENTRY WITHOUT PREJUDICE
FILED BY JOSHUA EPLING Receipt: 1087034 Date: 02/08/2016
2/8/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL ENTRY WITHOUT PREJUDICE
FILED BY JOSHUA EPLING Receipt: 1087034 Date: 02/08/2016
2/8/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL ENTRY WITHOUT PREJUDICE
FILED BY JOSHUA EPLING Receipt: 1087034 Date: 02/08/2016
1/25/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
1/25/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
11/3/2015
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
8/28/2015
ORDER: SERVICE BY PUBLICATION
7/21/2015
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE