Case Information
3/8/2016
2015CV03402
Common Pleas
Michael E Knapke
John A. Knapke Individual
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE MARCH 18, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.
Sean Culley
Docket History
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE MARCH 18, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE MARCH 18, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE MARCH 18, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.
12/13/2015
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE DECEMBER 23, 2015 AT 9:30 A.M.
7/30/2015
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
6/30/2015
CIVIL ALL OTHER