Docket History
4/15/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 5/20/16 FILED BY MATTHEW GLADWELL
4/15/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 5/20/16 FILED BY MATTHEW GLADWELL
4/15/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 5/20/16 FILED BY MATTHEW GLADWELL
3/7/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
3/7/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
3/7/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
2/4/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 11, 2016 FILED BY MATTHEW GLADWELL
2/4/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 11, 2016 FILED BY MATTHEW GLADWELL
2/4/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 11, 2016 FILED BY MATTHEW GLADWELL
2/4/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 11, 2016 FILED BY MATTHEW GLADWELL
9/18/2015
ORDER: SERVICE BY PUBLICATION
8/4/2015
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
AUGUST 25, 2015 AT 9:45 AM BY TELEPHONE
6/19/2015
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE