Docket History
4/22/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON MAY 25, 2016 AT 9:00 A.M.
4/22/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON MAY 25, 2016 AT 9:00 A.M.
4/22/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON MAY 25, 2016 AT 9:00 A.M.
4/20/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
.
4/20/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
.
4/14/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ENTRY RESETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON APRIL 18, 2016 AT 3:15 PM
4/14/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ENTRY RESETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON APRIL 18, 2016 AT 3:15 PM
4/14/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ENTRY RESETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON APRIL 18, 2016 AT 3:15 PM
4/14/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ENTRY RESETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON APRIL 18, 2016 AT 3:15 PM
6/17/2015
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE