Docket History
5/24/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - CASE SETTLED
5/24/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - CASE SETTLED
5/24/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - CASE SETTLED
2/11/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY DEADLINE AND CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE
2/11/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY DEADLINE AND CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE
2/11/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY DEADLINE AND CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE
2/11/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY DEADLINE AND CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE
8/11/2015
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
AUGUST 18, 2015 AT 9:45 AM BY TELEPHONE
8/6/2015
DECISION
SUSTAINING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT AND OVERRULING AS MOOT PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT
6/12/2015
CIVIL ALL OTHER