Docket History
4/27/2016
ORDER: DEFAULT JUDGMENT
4/27/2016
ORDER: DEFAULT JUDGMENT
4/27/2016
ORDER: DEFAULT JUDGMENT
4/13/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON MAY 13, 2016 AT 9:45 A.M.
4/13/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON MAY 13, 2016 AT 9:45 A.M.
4/13/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON MAY 13, 2016 AT 9:45 A.M.
4/13/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON MAY 13, 2016 AT 9:45 A.M.
7/30/2015
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION TO ANSWER OUT OF TIME
5/28/2015
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE