ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON MAY 13, 2016 AT 8:40 AM
Stephen Klein
Docket History
4/26/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON MAY 13, 2016 AT 8:40 AM
3/24/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
ORDERING COMPETENCY EVALUATION OF DEFENDANT JAMES BROWN
3/24/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
ORDERING COMPETENCY EVALUATION OF DEFENDANT JAMES BROWN
3/24/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
ORDERING COMPETENCY EVALUATION OF DEFENDANT JAMES BROWN
3/24/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
ORDERING COMPETENCY EVALUATION OF DEFENDANT JAMES BROWN
3/24/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
ORDERING COMPETENCY EVALUATION OF DEFENDANT JAMES BROWN
3/24/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
ORDERING COMPETENCY EVALUATION OF DEFENDANT JAMES BROWN
9/18/2015
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING CHAMBERS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON OCTOBER 20, 2015 AT 9:30 AM
8/14/2015
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR RESTRAINING ORDER, MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY RELIEF AND MOTION FOR ORDER OF RENT ESCROW ON SEPTEMBER 18, 2015 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM NO. 5
8/4/2015
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE ON AUGUST 14, 2015 AT 8:30 AM