Case Information
5/19/2016
2015CV01420
Common Pleas
Everbank, Ditech Financial Llc
Brian T Caughron
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
Bradley Toman, Bradley Toman
Docket History
5/19/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
5/19/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
5/19/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
4/15/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING EXTENSION TO 5/13/16 TO FILE RESPONSE; REPLY DUE 5/20/16
4/15/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING EXTENSION TO 5/13/16 TO FILE RESPONSE; REPLY DUE 5/20/16
4/15/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING EXTENSION TO 5/13/16 TO FILE RESPONSE; REPLY DUE 5/20/16
4/15/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING EXTENSION TO 5/13/16 TO FILE RESPONSE; REPLY DUE 5/20/16
4/7/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RESPONSE DUE 4/21/16; REPLY DUE 4/28/16
4/7/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RESPONSE DUE 4/21/16; REPLY DUE 4/28/16
4/7/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RESPONSE DUE 4/21/16; REPLY DUE 4/28/16
4/6/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT INSTANTER
4/6/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT INSTANTER
4/6/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT INSTANTER
11/10/2015
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHER RESPONSIVE PLEADING OUT OF TIME
11/10/2015
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHER RESPONSIVE PLEADING OUT OF TIME
11/3/2015
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
10/29/2015
ORDER: REACTIVATE/REINSTATE CASE
7/20/2015
ORDER: SERVICE BY PUBLICATION