Case Information
3/28/2016
2015CV00965
Common Pleas
Us Bank National Association
Tonya E. Qualls
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 1, 2016
Matthew Gladwell
Docket History
3/28/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 1, 2016
3/28/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 1, 2016
3/28/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 1, 2016
2/25/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 1, 2016 FILED BY Thomas Drinan
2/25/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 1, 2016 FILED BY Thomas Drinan
2/25/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 1, 2016 FILED BY Thomas Drinan
2/25/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 1, 2016 FILED BY Thomas Drinan
8/28/2015
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 10/16/2015 FILED BY MATTHEW GLADWELL
2/20/2015
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE