NOTICE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
OF DEFENDANT EVER GREEN LAWN CARE, INC., ONLY FILED BY KENNETH IGNOZZI
Kenneth Ignozzi
Docket History
3/24/2016
NOTICE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
OF DEFENDANT EVER GREEN LAWN CARE, INC., ONLY FILED BY KENNETH IGNOZZI
3/24/2016
NOTICE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
OF DEFENDANT EVER GREEN LAWN CARE, INC., ONLY FILED BY KENNETH IGNOZZI
3/24/2016
NOTICE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
OF DEFENDANT EVER GREEN LAWN CARE, INC., ONLY FILED BY KENNETH IGNOZZI
3/24/2016
NOTICE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
OF DEFENDANT EVER GREEN LAWN CARE, INC., ONLY FILED BY KENNETH IGNOZZI
3/24/2016
NOTICE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
OF DEFENDANT EVER GREEN LAWN CARE, INC., ONLY FILED BY KENNETH IGNOZZI
2/6/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED ON FEBRUARY 02, 2016. RESPONDENT'S MEMORANDUM CONTRA IS DUE ON OR BEFORE MARCH 25, 2016. MOVANT'S REPLY IS DUE ON OR BEFORE APRIL 02, 2016