Docket History
5/24/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
AMENDED ENTRY SETTING SUBMISSION DATE OF JUNE 23, 2016
5/24/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
AMENDED ENTRY SETTING SUBMISSION DATE OF JUNE 23, 2016
5/24/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
AMENDED ENTRY SETTING SUBMISSION DATE OF JUNE 23, 2016
5/6/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
AND ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO COMPEL
5/6/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
AND ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO COMPEL
5/6/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
AND ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO COMPEL
5/6/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
AND ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO COMPEL
5/3/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
MOTION AS TO PUNITIVE DAMAGES AND ATTORNEY FEES RESPONSE DUE 5/17/16; REPLY DUE 5/24/16
5/3/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
MOTION AS TO PUNITIVE DAMAGES AND ATTORNEY FEES RESPONSE DUE 5/17/16; REPLY DUE 5/24/16
11/3/2015
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON NOVEMBER 17, 2015 AT 8:30 AM
8/7/2015
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ON AUGUST 14, 2015 AT 9:00 AM