Docket History
3/24/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 7, 2016 FILED BY DAVID BRADY
3/24/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 7, 2016 FILED BY DAVID BRADY
3/24/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 7, 2016 FILED BY DAVID BRADY
3/24/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 7, 2016 FILED BY DAVID BRADY
3/24/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 7, 2016 FILED BY DAVID BRADY
8/10/2015
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
8/6/2015
DECISION
SUSTAINING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL
12/2/2014
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE