DECISION
NEITHER SUSTAINING NOR OVERRULING PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE, BUT SUGGESTING, INSTEAD, THAT THE MONTGOMERY COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF JOB AND FAMILY SERVICES MUST BE JOINED AS A PARTY TO THE LITIGATION
4/14/2016
DECISION
ENTRY AND ORDER OVERRULING PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE #3
4/14/2016
DECISION
OVERRULING PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE #2
4/14/2016
DECISION
NEITHER SUSTAINING NOR OVERRULING PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE, BUT SUGGESTING, INSTEAD, THAT THE MONTGOMERY COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF JOB AND FAMILY SERVICES MUST BE JOINED AS A PARTY TO THE LITIGATION
4/14/2016
DECISION
ENTRY AND ORDER OVERRULING PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE #3
4/14/2016
DECISION
OVERRULING PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE #2
4/14/2016
DECISION
NEITHER SUSTAINING NOR OVERRULING PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE, BUT SUGGESTING, INSTEAD, THAT THE MONTGOMERY COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF JOB AND FAMILY SERVICES MUST BE JOINED AS A PARTY TO THE LITIGATION
4/14/2016
DECISION
ENTRY AND ORDER OVERRULING PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE #3
4/14/2016
DECISION
OVERRULING PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE #2
4/14/2016
DECISION
NEITHER SUSTAINING NOR OVERRULING PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE, BUT SUGGESTING, INSTEAD, THAT THE MONTGOMERY COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF JOB AND FAMILY SERVICES MUST BE JOINED AS A PARTY TO THE LITIGATION
4/14/2016
DECISION
ENTRY AND ORDER OVERRULING PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE #3
4/14/2016
DECISION
OVERRULING PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE #2
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON MARCH 15, 2016 AT 9:00 AM
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON MARCH 15, 2016 AT 9:00 AM
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON MARCH 15, 2016 AT 9:00 AM
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON MARCH 15, 2016 AT 9:00 AM
8/28/2015
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING DEFENDANT UP TO AND INCLUDING 9/8/15 IN WHICH TO FILE THEIR REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
8/14/2015
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON AUGUST 25, 2015 AT 8:30 AM
8/6/2015
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON AUGUST 14, 2015 AT 8:45 AM
8/6/2015
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RESPONSE DUE 8/19/15; REPLY DUE 8/26/15