Case Information
4/6/2016
2014CV04211
Common Pleas
Shirley A Kossoudji
Rick D Stamps
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON DEFENDANT'S 60 (B) MOTION -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE APRIL 20, 2016 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE APRIL 27, 2016
Matthew Sorg
Docket History
4/6/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON DEFENDANT'S 60 (B) MOTION -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE APRIL 20, 2016 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE APRIL 27, 2016
4/6/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON DEFENDANT'S 60 (B) MOTION -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE APRIL 20, 2016 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE APRIL 27, 2016
8/22/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON SEPTEMBER 10, 2014 AT 9:30 AM
8/22/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON SEPTEMBER 10, 2014 AT 9:30 AM
7/21/2014
CIVIL ALL OTHER