Docket History
1/25/2016
NOTICE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
OF DEFENDANTS REESE ELECTRIC INC, RUSTY REESE AND SUNESIS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY FILED BY JAMES GALLAGHER
1/20/2016
DECISION
SUSTAINING DEFENDANT CITY OF DAYTON, OHIO, ET AL.S, MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
1/20/2016
DECISION
SUSTAINING DEFENDANT CITY OF DAYTON, OHIO, ET AL.S, MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
1/20/2016
DECISION
SUSTAINING DEFENDANT CITY OF DAYTON, OHIO, ET AL.S, MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
1/20/2016
DECISION
SUSTAINING DEFENDANT CITY OF DAYTON, OHIO, ET AL.S, MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
8/15/2014
NOTICE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
OF DEFENDANT DAYTON AIRPORT PARKING LLC FILED BY JAMES GALLAGHER
8/15/2014
NOTICE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
OF DEFENDANT DAYTON AIRPORT PARKING LLC FILED BY JAMES GALLAGHER
7/30/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
AUGUST 12, 2014 AT 9:45 AM BY TELEPHONE
7/30/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
AUGUST 12, 2014 AT 9:45 AM BY TELEPHONE
6/25/2014
PERSONAL INJURY