Docket History
5/20/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - CASE SETTLED
5/20/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - CASE SETTLED
3/7/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE MARCH 11, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.
3/7/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE MARCH 11, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.
3/7/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE MARCH 11, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.
2/13/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ASSESS COSTS OF TRIAL TO DEFENDANT
6/17/2014
PERSONAL INJURY