Docket History
4/18/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - ADMINISTRATIVE Receipt: 1097990 Date: 04/18/2016
4/18/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - ADMINISTRATIVE Receipt: 1097990 Date: 04/18/2016
4/18/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - ADMINISTRATIVE Receipt: 1097990 Date: 04/18/2016
8/17/2015
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON SEPTEMBER 11, 2015 AT 9:45 A.M.
8/5/2015
JUDGMENT ENTRY
AGREED
8/22/2014
ORDER: DEFAULT JUDGMENT
AND DECREE IN FORECLOSURE
8/22/2014
ORDER: DEFAULT JUDGMENT
AND DECREE IN FORECLOSURE
5/5/2014
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE