Case Information
8/29/2014
2014CV02630
Common Pleas
Charles Brown Jr
City Of Dayton Nuisance Appeal Board
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
AND ORDER DISMISSING ADMINISTRATIVE APPEAL
Pro Se
Docket History
8/22/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE 8/29/14 AT 8:45 A.M.
8/22/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE 8/29/14 AT 8:45 A.M.
7/8/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
ORDERING TRANSCRIPT FILED WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS
5/27/2014
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
FAILURE TO FILE PRAECIPE ORDERING TRANSCRIPT
5/5/2014
ADMINISTRATIVE APPEAL