Case Information
4/22/2016
2014CV01713
Common Pleas
Terry Toney
City Of Dayton
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
RESCHEDULING IN PERSON STATUS CONFERENCE FROM MAY 9, 2016 TO MAY 19, 2016 AT 2:30 PM
Thomas Manning
Docket History
4/22/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
RESCHEDULING IN PERSON STATUS CONFERENCE FROM MAY 9, 2016 TO MAY 19, 2016 AT 2:30 PM
4/22/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
RESCHEDULING IN PERSON STATUS CONFERENCE FROM MAY 9, 2016 TO MAY 19, 2016 AT 2:30 PM
4/22/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
RESCHEDULING IN PERSON STATUS CONFERENCE FROM MAY 9, 2016 TO MAY 19, 2016 AT 2:30 PM
8/12/2014
NOTICE: DISMISSAL ENTRY WITHOUT PREJUDICE
OF CLAIMS OF AARON BERGER AND ALICIA BERGER ONLY FILED BY THOMAS MANNING
3/25/2014
DECLARATORY JUDGMENT
3/25/2014
DECLARATORY JUDGMENT