Case Information
4/19/2016
2014CV00940
Common Pleas
Merica M. Turnbow Individual
Dayton Osteopathic Hospital
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
MAY 19, 2016 AT 1:30 PM BY TELEPHONE
Timothy Chappars
Docket History
4/19/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
MAY 19, 2016 AT 1:30 PM BY TELEPHONE
4/19/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
MAY 19, 2016 AT 1:30 PM BY TELEPHONE
2/11/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
FEBRUARY 19, 2016 AT 10:00 AM BY TELEPHONE
2/11/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
FEBRUARY 19, 2016 AT 10:00 AM BY TELEPHONE
2/11/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
FEBRUARY 19, 2016 AT 10:00 AM BY TELEPHONE
2/11/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
FEBRUARY 19, 2016 AT 10:00 AM BY TELEPHONE
1/14/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
FEBRUARY 9, 2016 AT 9:30 AM BY TELEPHONE
1/14/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
FEBRUARY 9, 2016 AT 9:30 AM BY TELEPHONE
5/27/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
JUNE 19, 2014 AT 9:30 AM BY TELEPHONE
5/27/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
JUNE 19, 2014 AT 9:30 AM BY TELEPHONE
4/24/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
MAY 13, 2014 AT 10:00 AM BY TELEPHONE
4/24/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO PROVIDE AFFIDAVIT OF MERIT
4/24/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
MAY 13, 2014 AT 10:00 AM BY TELEPHONE
4/24/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO PROVIDE AFFIDAVIT OF MERIT
2/14/2014
MEDICAL MALPRACTICE