Docket History
7/27/2015
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
NUNC PRO TUNC AMENDED
7/10/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
AMENDED IN REM
7/10/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
AMENDED IN REM
7/8/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
5/6/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JUNE 13, 2014 AT 11:00 A.M.
5/6/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JUNE 13, 2014 AT 11:00 A.M.
5/6/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JUNE 13, 2014 AT 11:00 A.M.
1/24/2014
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE