Case Information
3/14/2016
2014CV00419
Common Pleas
Jack Bausman
American Family Insurance Group
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE MARCH 31, 2016 AT 10:15 AM
John Smalley
Docket History
3/14/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE MARCH 31, 2016 AT 10:15 AM
3/14/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE MARCH 31, 2016 AT 10:15 AM
3/14/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE MARCH 31, 2016 AT 10:15 AM
8/26/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE SEPTEMBER 4, 2014 AT 10:30 AM
1/22/2014
OTHER TORT