Case Information
8/28/2014
2013CV07923
Common Pleas
Jpmc Specialty Mortgage Llc
Dejuane T Miller Sr
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 17, 2014 FILED BY CARSON ROTHFUSS
Carson Rothfuss
Docket History
7/21/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
7/21/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
5/6/2014
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
5/6/2014
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
5/6/2014
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
12/31/2013
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE