Docket History
9/15/2014
NOTICE: DISMISSAL ENTRY WITH PREJUDICE
STIPULATED FILED BY LUCAS WILDER
7/29/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE DISPOSITIVE MOTION DATE
7/29/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE DISPOSITIVE MOTION DATE
2/13/2014
ORDER: VACATE JUDGMENT ENTRY
ENTRY AND ORDER OF RELIEF FROM DEFAULT JUDGMENT
2/13/2014
ORDER: VACATE JUDGMENT ENTRY
ENTRY AND ORDER OF RELIEF FROM DEFAULT JUDGMENT
2/7/2014
ORDER: DEFAULT JUDGMENT
AGAINST DEFENDANT
2/7/2014
ORDER: DEFAULT JUDGMENT
AGAINST DEFENDANT
2/4/2014
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
12/30/2013
CIVIL ALL OTHER