Case Information
9/9/2014
2013CV07746
Common Pleas
Us Bank National Association
James Gorman
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 26, 2014 FILED BY JOSHUA EPLING
Joshua Epling
Docket History
9/9/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 26, 2014 FILED BY JOSHUA EPLING
4/25/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
4/25/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
4/7/2014
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
12/19/2013
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE