Docket History
9/12/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR 11/7/14
9/12/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR 11/7/14
9/12/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR 11/7/14
5/22/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR JUNE 20, 2014 AT 10:00 AM FILED BY CANICE FOGARTY
5/22/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR JUNE 20, 2014 AT 10:00 AM FILED BY CANICE FOGARTY
5/22/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR JUNE 20, 2014 AT 10:00 AM FILED BY CANICE FOGARTY
1/17/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
12/10/2013
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE