Case Information
8/26/2014
2013CV07344
Common Pleas
Delores J. Kelhoffer
Bureau Of Workers Compensation
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON SEPTEMBER 12, 2014 AT 8:45 A.M.
Megan Richards
Docket History
2/19/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
3/13/14 @ 2:30 P.M.
2/19/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
3/13/14 @ 2:30 P.M.
1/16/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION TO FILE INSTANTER
1/16/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION TO FILE INSTANTER
1/14/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
TELEPHONE
12/2/2013
WORKER COMPENSATION