NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 10/31/14 FILED BY KEVIN WILLIAMS
Kevin Williams
Docket History
9/12/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 10/31/14 FILED BY KEVIN WILLIAMS
6/10/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON JULY 11, 2014, RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE JULY 25, 2014 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE AUGUST 01, 2014
6/10/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON JULY 11, 2014, RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE JULY 25, 2014 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE AUGUST 01, 2014
4/8/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JUNE 10, 2014 AT 9:00 AM
4/8/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JUNE 10, 2014 AT 9:00 AM
4/8/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JUNE 10, 2014 AT 9:00 AM
3/18/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON APRIL 08, 2014 AT 9:30 AM
3/18/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON APRIL 08, 2014 AT 9:30 AM
1/10/2014
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
1/10/2014
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
.