Case Information
8/26/2014
2013CV06934
Common Pleas
Citimortgage Inc Successor By Merger To Abn Amro
Ricky L Merrell
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
ENTRY WITHDRAWING PROPERTY FROM SHERIFF'S SALE
Craig Thomas
Docket History
8/26/2014
ORDER: DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE
8/15/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 3, 2014 FILED BY CRAIG THOMAS
8/15/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 3, 2014 FILED BY CRAIG THOMAS
7/21/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
ENTRY WITHDRAWING PROPERTY FROM SHERIFF'S SALE
7/21/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
ENTRY WITHDRAWING PROPERTY FROM SHERIFF'S SALE
2/5/2014
ORDER: SERVICE BY PUBLICATION