Case Information
9/5/2014
2013CV06689
Common Pleas
R L (a Minor), Rosalind A. Lawrence
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Julia Kolber, Julia Kolber
Docket History
4/7/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT
1/3/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON FEBRUARY 6, 2014 AT 9:30 A.M.
1/3/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON FEBRUARY 6, 2014 AT 9:30 A.M.
10/31/2013
OTHER TORT