Docket History
3/24/2016
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY David Smith
3/24/2016
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY David Smith
3/24/2016
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY David Smith
3/24/2016
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY David Smith
3/24/2016
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY David Smith
8/14/2015
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
REACTIVATING CASE FOR POST-JUDGMENT PROCEEDINGS ONLY
5/7/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
ENTRY WITHDRAWING PROPERTY FROM SHERIFF'S SALE
1/14/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY
AND DECREE IN FORECLOSURE AND FOR REFORMATION OF DEED
10/23/2013
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE