Docket History
4/29/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW
ORDER OF SALE
4/13/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
41822646
4/13/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
41822646
4/13/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
41822646
4/13/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
41822646
8/28/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 17, 2014 FILED BY LORI WIGHT
5/27/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 6-27-14 FILED BY LORI WIGHT
12/30/2013
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
12/9/2013
ORDER: DISMISS/FAILURE TO PROSECUTE Receipt: 955409 Date: 12/10/2013
11/19/2013
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
10/10/2013
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE