Docket History
5/5/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
41995703
5/5/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
41995703
3/7/2016
ORDER: REACTIVATE/REINSTATE CASE
FOR POST-JUDGMENT PROCEEDINGS ONLY
3/7/2016
ORDER: REACTIVATE/REINSTATE CASE
FOR POST-JUDGMENT PROCEEDINGS ONLY
3/7/2016
ORDER: REACTIVATE/REINSTATE CASE
FOR POST-JUDGMENT PROCEEDINGS ONLY
8/28/2015
NOTICE: BANKRUPCTY - NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC STAY OF EXECUTION
FILED BY Matthew McKelvey
8/21/2015
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY Wayne Novick
8/18/2015
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
REACTIVATING CASE FOR POST-JUDGMENT PROCEEDINGS ONLY
3/18/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY ELLEN FORNASH
3/18/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY ELLEN FORNASH
10/3/2013
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE