Docket History
8/22/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 10/10/14 FILED BY CHANNING ULBRICH
7/30/2014
ORDER: DEFAULT JUDGMENT
ON CROSS CLAIM OF DEFENDANT TOWNEHOUSES OF CATALPA PHASE I CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION
7/30/2014
ORDER: DEFAULT JUDGMENT
ON CROSS CLAIM OF DEFENDANT TOWNEHOUSES OF CATALPA PHASE I CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION
7/9/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
7/9/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
5/29/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JUNE 17, 2014 AT 9:30 A.M.
5/29/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JUNE 17, 2014 AT 9:30 A.M.
5/29/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JUNE 17, 2014 AT 9:30 A.M.
12/5/2013
NOTICE: BANKRUPCTY - NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC STAY OF EXECUTION
FILED BY Andrew Zeigler
9/19/2013
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE