Docket History
9/9/2014
ORDER: CONSOLIDATE CASE(S)
ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASE # 2013 CV 5611 W/CASE # 2014 CV 3935
9/9/2014
ORDER: CONSOLIDATE CASE(S)
ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASE # 2013 CV 5611 W/CASE # 2014 CV 3935
7/31/2014
DECISION
SETTING SUBMISSION DATES FOR NON ORAL HEARING SET FOR 8-21-14
7/31/2014
DECISION
SETTING SUBMISSION DATES FOR NON ORAL HEARING SET FOR 8-21-14
7/31/2014
DECISION
SETTING SUBMISSION DATES FOR NON ORAL HEARING SET FOR 8-21-14
10/28/2013
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON JANUARY 09, 2014 AT 830AM
9/18/2013
CIVIL ALL OTHER