NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 10/10/14 FILED BY ANGELA KIRK
Angela Kirk
Docket History
8/22/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 10/10/14 FILED BY ANGELA KIRK
12/26/2013
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE JANUARY 09, 2014 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE JANUARY 16, 2014
10/3/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON NOVEMBER 06, 2013 AT 9:00 AM
9/5/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON OCTOBER 02, 2013 AT 9:00 AM
8/1/2013
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON AUGUST 30, 2013 AT 9:45 AM