Docket History
9/15/2014
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
AND DISTRIBUTION
5/16/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR 6-13-14 FILED BY JOHN CLUNK
5/16/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR 6-13-14 FILED BY JOHN CLUNK
5/16/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR 6-13-14 FILED BY JOHN CLUNK
1/17/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY
1/17/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY
1/16/2014
ORDER: REACTIVATE/REINSTATE CASE
TO ACTIVE DOCKET
1/16/2014
ORDER: REACTIVATE/REINSTATE CASE
TO ACTIVE DOCKET
12/23/2013
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
12/23/2013
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
10/7/2013
ORDER: SERVICE BY PUBLICATION
7/23/2013
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE