Case Information
9/5/2014
2013CV04324
Common Pleas
Diana Jones Individual, Jeffrey Jones Individual
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING EXTENSION OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEADLINES
Frank Payson, Frank Payson
Docket History
11/21/2013
DECISION
SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS
9/10/2013
DECISION
SUSTAINING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS
8/22/2013
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
MONTGOMERY COUNTY ENGINEER'S OFFICE MOTION TO DISMISS - SUBMISSION DATE SEPTEMBER 12, 2013
7/22/2013
CIVIL ALL OTHER