Case Information
8/27/2014
2013CV04098
Common Pleas
Hibu Inc Formerly Yellow Book Inc
Restoration Resources Of Dayton Llc
DECISION
OVERRULING MOTION OF PLAINTIFF TO HAVE REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS DEEMED ADMITTED AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Mark Sheriff
Docket History
2/13/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
MARCH 18, 2014 AT 9:30 AM BY TELEPHONE
2/13/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
MARCH 18, 2014 AT 9:30 AM BY TELEPHONE
1/29/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
FEBRUARY 11, 2014 AT 9:45 AM BY TELEPHONE
1/17/2014
DECISION
SUSTAINING DEFENDANT CHRISTY DIERUFS MOTION TO FILE ANSWER INSTANTER
1/17/2014
DECISION
SUSTAINING DEFENDANT CHRISTY DIERUFS MOTION TO FILE ANSWER INSTANTER
7/11/2013
CIVIL ALL OTHER